U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Ricks
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 12, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 20, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 27, 2016: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • April 25, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2016: [Designations of Record]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Designations of Record]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Designations of Record]
  • March 17, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
  • March 17, 2016: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.