U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Wilson et al v. Salmon School District #291 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 09, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Certify]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Status Report]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 21, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2017: [Certify]
  • September 06, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2017: [Response (generic)]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 08, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [ADR Plan]
  • October 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 16, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 25, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 15, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.