U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Paulk v. Kempf et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • December 11, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Declaration]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 04, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 03, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • July 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Reopening Case]
  • May 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Request]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 05, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 18, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 18, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 18, 2016: [Stay]
  • March 18, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 18, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.