U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:01-cv-00495
  • Case Name: Tullis v. Turner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Request]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.