U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Lazinka v. Little et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 19, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2016: [Discovery]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 20, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 03, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 18, 2016: [Produce]
  • August 02, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 10, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 19, 2016: [Compel]
  • April 19, 2016: [Expedite]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 04, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 18, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 18, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 18, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.