U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Corizon Health, Inc. v. CorrecTek, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2016: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • December 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • December 01, 2016: [Expedite]
  • December 01, 2016: [Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • October 17, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 15, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 23, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 23, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 27, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 27, 2016: [Change Venue]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 22, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.