U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00532
  • Case Name: Wright v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 13, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 23, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.