U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Off-Spec Solutions, LLC v. H.J. Heinz Company, L.P.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 08, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 07, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 11, 2018: [Compel]
  • July 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 05, 2018: [Protective Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2018: [Declaration]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 15, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • March 13, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 08, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 25, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 17, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 17, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Litigation Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 29, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • September 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 29, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 25, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 25, 2017: [Statement]
  • July 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 20, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 13, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 14, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 24, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 24, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.