U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Mickelsen Farms, LLC et al v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service (APHIS) et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 22, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 28, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment]
  • November 27, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • November 27, 2018: [Entry of Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • December 13, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 30, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 20, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 23, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 22, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order]
  • July 29, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • July 29, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.