U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Collis v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [USCA Order]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 06, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 06, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 24, 2016: [Permanent Injunction]
  • March 24, 2016: [Complaint]
  • March 24, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.