U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00126
  • Case Name: Meyer v. Plumer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Complaint]
  • March 29, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 29, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.