U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Hallquist v. IDOC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Reopen Case]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Vacate]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 24, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Receipt]
  • March 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.