U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Grivet v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 24, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2016: [Supplement]
  • June 06, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • June 06, 2016: [Entry of Default]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • March 29, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.