U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project v. Bureau of Land Management et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 22, 2016: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 28, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 28, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 26, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 04, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order]
  • March 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 30, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.