U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Alfaro v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Response (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • July 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • December 16, 2016: [Reopen Case]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 30, 2016: [Receipt]
  • March 30, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.