U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Hohnhorst et al v. General Motors, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order CTO]
  • April 15, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 30, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.