U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Padilla-Ramirez v. Bible et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Letter]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [USCA Order]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 07, 2016: [Appeal Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Transcript Request]
  • June 03, 2016: [Transcript Request]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 13, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Writ Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 08, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • April 08, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 05, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order]
  • March 30, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 30, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 30, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 30, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.