U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Porrett et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Memorandum & Opinion]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • July 12, 2016: [Excerpt of Record]
  • July 12, 2016: [Appellees Brief]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Appendix]
  • June 15, 2016: [Appellants Brief]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • April 28, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2016: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.