U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00134
  • Case Name: Thies v. Kemph
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Response (generic)]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Errata]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 23, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 07, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 02, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 31, 2016: [Receipt]
  • March 31, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.