U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00136
  • Case Name: ACUITY v. The Management Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 08, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 17, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 17, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 01, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Status Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.