U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Paxton v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Letter]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 04, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 04, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 04, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.