U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Lequieu v. US Post Office - Bonners Ferry et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order Reopening Case]
  • October 23, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 25, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 04, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 04, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.