U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Simplot Livestock Co et al v. Sutfin Land and Livestock
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • September 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 29, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • September 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 29, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 16, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 10, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 05, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 10, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 06, 2016: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 13, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 13, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 13, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 05, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.