U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Lake Pend Oreille School District No. 84 v. Affiniti, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 17, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2016: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 05, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 04, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.