U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Thomason v. Moeller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Request]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 16, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Recusal]
  • September 06, 2017: [Errata]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • August 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 29, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Sanctions]
  • August 04, 2017: [Sanctions]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Reconsideration]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • August 17, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 16, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2016: [Status Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 06, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 05, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 05, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • July 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 17, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2016: [Joinder]
  • June 15, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 15, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 15, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 13, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • June 13, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Joinder]
  • June 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • June 08, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 08, 2016: [Service]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • May 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 02, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Status Report]
  • April 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
  • April 05, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 05, 2016: [Receipt]
  • April 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.