U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00142
  • Case Name: Miller v. State of Idaho Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 18, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 30, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order]
  • June 10, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Bond]
  • April 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.