U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Williams v. Fox
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Clarify]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sanctions]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 09, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Clarify]
  • October 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 16, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Reconsideration]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • September 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Request]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 10, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [Clarify]
  • April 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Protective Order]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Request]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 07, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 31, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 31, 2017: [Sanctions]
  • October 27, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Compel]
  • September 15, 2017: [Compel]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 03, 2017: [Supplement]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Request]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2017: [Clarify]
  • May 23, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 15, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Sever]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Sanctions]
  • January 06, 2017: [Strike]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 22, 2016: [Compel]
  • December 12, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Stay]
  • October 28, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 17, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Relief]
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 12, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2016: [Request]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 02, 2016: [Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 07, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 08, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Receipt]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 13, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.