U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Hartsock et al v. RECREATION RESOURCE MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Vacate]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 06, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 02, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 18, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 17, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 17, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 27, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.