U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Kinley v. Trust Company of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 08, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.