U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00475
  • Case Name: St. Luke's Health System, LTD. et al v. Allied World National Assurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 06, 2017: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [USCA Order]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
  • April 08, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.