U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Kelly v. Rolland
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 14, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2016: [Letter]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Consent Filed]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 11, 2016: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.