U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00150
  • Case Name: McGiboney v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Set Aside Judgment]
  • October 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 19, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2018: [Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Dismiss]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2017
  • May 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Discovery]
  • April 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 11, 2016: [Errata]
  • April 11, 2016: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.