U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Townsend v. Basterrechea et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 10, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 10, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 03, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 03, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 06, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.