U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Rutherford v. City of Pocatello et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.