U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Plucinski v. Payette County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • August 31, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 04, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [ADR Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 18, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 07, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • July 01, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Receipt]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • May 25, 2016: [Clarify]
  • May 18, 2016: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 16, 2016: [Bond]
  • May 13, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.