U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Landowske v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • September 08, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 14, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • July 14, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 12, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 12, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.