U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Cole v. Cardez Credit Affiliates LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 08, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 02, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • October 07, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Receipt]
  • April 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.