U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Perez v. Parklane Management Company LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order]
  • July 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 22, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 22, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 17, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 03, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 03, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 13, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.