U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00156
  • Case Name: DeVan v. Meldrum et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Return Mail]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • March 14, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order Reopening Case]
  • March 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 11, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 11, 2017: [Relief]
  • May 02, 2017: [Request]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 14, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 14, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.