U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Andersen Manufacturing Inc. v. Wyers Products Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 27, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2016: [Counterclaim]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 05, 2016: [Errata]
  • May 05, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • April 18, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.