U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cv-00300
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 6107 Hogg Road, Marsing Owyhee County, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [USCA Order]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [USCA Order]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 21, 2017: [Reconsideration]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 04, 2017: [Clarify]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Return of Property]
  • December 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2016: [Return of Property]
  • December 07, 2016: [Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 08, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • November 03, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • October 25, 2016: [Discovery]
  • October 20, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • September 07, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • August 29, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 07, 2016: [Clarify]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 06, 2016: [Recusal]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2016: [Return Mail]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2016: [Strike]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.