U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Maddox et al v. City of Sandpoint et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Taxation of Costs]
  • November 25, 2019: [Costs Taxed]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Transcript Request]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 26, 2019: [Taxation of Costs]
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • August 12, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 12, 2019: [Jury Notes]
  • August 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 12, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 08, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • August 07, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • August 07, 2019: [Objection]
  • August 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • August 05, 2019: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • August 05, 2019: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 01, 2019: [Supplement]
  • August 01, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 30, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 30, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 29, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 29, 2019: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • July 29, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 29, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • July 29, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 29, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 29, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 24, 2019: [ADR Plan]
  • July 24, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 19, 2019: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • July 19, 2019: [Pretrial Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [In Limine]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 21, 2019: [Seal]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 28, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 14, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 14, 2019: [Statement]
  • February 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 14, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 12, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 14, 2018: [Status Report]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Statement]
  • November 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 08, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 26, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order]
  • October 09, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 13, 2017: [Statement]
  • January 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • December 16, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • December 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 07, 2016: [ADR Plan]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 28, 2016: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • September 21, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 19, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 16, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • September 06, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 06, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2016: [Complaint]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • August 05, 2016: [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 06, 2016: [Service by Publication]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 30, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • May 13, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 11, 2016: [Declaration]
  • May 11, 2016: [Service]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2016: [Receipt]
  • April 29, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • April 18, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 18, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 15, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2016: [Waive]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.