U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Zenahlik et al v. Ballard et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 09, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 09, 2018: [Response (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 16, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 25, 2017: [Compel]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • September 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2016: [Entry of Default]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 15, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 07, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • June 03, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.