U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Teton County Republican Central Committee v. Hansen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2016: [Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 18, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 18, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • April 16, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.