U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Sapp v. Ada County Jail Mail/Property Room
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 12, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • May 05, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 18, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 18, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 18, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.