U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00164
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Howell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Statement]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 23, 2019: [Settlement]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Stay]
  • December 06, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 05, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 26, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 12, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 12, 2018: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • October 12, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • October 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 08, 2018: [Intervenor Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Death]
  • September 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 10, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 09, 2018: [Joinder]
  • July 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 29, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 15, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 15, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 05, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 05, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 05, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Litigation Order]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [Status Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 08, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Status Report]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Status Report]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Stay]
  • May 15, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Status Report]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 15, 2017: [Intervene]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Stay]
  • February 14, 2017: [Status Report]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 13, 2017: [Status Report]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Status Report]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2016: [Stay]
  • November 14, 2016: [Status Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Status Report]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Status Report]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2016: [1-Exparte Document-to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • August 15, 2016: [Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 15, 2016: [Intervene]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2016: [Stay]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 19, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 19, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.