U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Norman v. Cassia County Joint School District No. 151 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 22, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 19, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.