U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Christiansen v. OfficeMax Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order]
  • April 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 19, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 07, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 23, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 22, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 15, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order]
  • April 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 19, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.