U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cv-00422
  • Case Name: Grist v. Carlin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 28, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 03, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • January 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2017: [Clarify]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 23, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 12, 2016: [Traverse]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • June 27, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.