U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Murphy v. Gentry
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 17, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2016: [Consent Filed]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 21, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.